+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 436, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2435.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 3276.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 10).
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3059.)
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 2792.)
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (July 3).
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 577.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 388.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 1.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 12, 2013: SB 269 Hill Senate Third Reading By BONILLA
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
September 12, 2013: Unfinished Supp 2 SB269 Hill Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
August 30, 2013: SB 269 Hill Senate Third Reading By BONILLA Amend By BONILLA Set #1
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
July 3, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
June 11, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB269 Hill
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 2
April 1, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor