+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 601, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5685.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 5619.)
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 22.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6309.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1347.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 364.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 14.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 24, 2018: Unfinished Business SB269 McGuire Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 22, 2018: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
August 16, 2018: SB 269 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 8, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 26, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB269 McGuire
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 3, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 14, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor