+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 503, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2530.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2956.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On July 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1003.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 804.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 4, 2019: Unfinished Business SB267 Wieckowski Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 3, 2019: SB 267 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Fong
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 14, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
July 1, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
May 9, 2019: Consent Calendar SB267
- Yeas: 38
April 23, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor