+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor