+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 28 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor