+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Held under submission.
- Set, second hearing.
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 2). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 971.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 464.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 1.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 25, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2014: Be referred to Committee on Labor and Employment.
- Yeas: 11
May 20, 2013: Special Consent #5 SB263 Monning
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
April 8, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor