+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 180, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
On August 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1849.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2486.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11).
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 675.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 464.) (April 8).
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 1.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 15, 2013: Unfinished Business SB262 Monning Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 8, 2013: SB 262 Monning Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2013: Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 11, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB262 Monning
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 2
April 8, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor