+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 312, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2279.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 2958.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1113.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1009.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 468.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2013: Unfinished Business SB260 Hancock Concurrence
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
September 6, 2013: SB 260 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BLOOM
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
July 2, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB260 Hancock
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 9, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor