+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2164.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 2841.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2795.)
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Atkins.
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
On August 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (August 7).
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 941.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 882.) (May 8).
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
September 6, 2013: Unfinished Business SB258 Lieu Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
September 3, 2013: SB 258 Lieu Senate Third Reading By PEREA
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB258 Lieu
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
May 8, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor