+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1198.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1094.) (May 16).
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 437.) (March 25).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 25.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 3, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
May 21, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB258 Hertzberg et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
April 22, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
March 25, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6