+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2442.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2796.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10))
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 1 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1297.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1150.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 4.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 418.) (March 25).
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 25.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 3, 2015: Unfinished Business SB252 Leno Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 2, 2015: SB 252 Leno Senate Third Reading By CHIU
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB252 Leno
- Yeas: 40
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor