+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2055.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2492.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- June 10 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 823.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 712.) (April 10).
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 11, 2019: Special Consent SB251 B. & F.I.
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2019: SB 251 B. & F.I. Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
June 24, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 12
April 25, 2019: Consent Calendar SB251 B. & F.I. (Bradford)
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Banking and Financial Institutions
Type:
Primary Sponsor