+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 20 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 20, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 8, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 8, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor