+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governors veto died on file.
On September 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 5009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate.
On August 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 25. Page 6756.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6284.)
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to the Assembly.
- From inactive file.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Steinberg.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 25. Page 2595.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 2).
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 805.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 291.) (March 13).
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 13.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On December 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
On December 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2014: W/O REF. TO FILE SB25 Steinberg Concurrence
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 6
August 19, 2013: SB 25 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By BONTA
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 10
June 12, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
June 12, 2013: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB25 Steinberg
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 5
March 13, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor