+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9 a.m.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3039.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On July 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 919.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 465.) (March 27).
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 27.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 20.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 5, 2019: SB 249 Nielsen Third Reading Urgency By Gallagher
- Yeas: 79
August 14, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
July 3, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
May 2, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB249 Nielsen Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
March 27, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor