+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- (Corrected August 29).
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 5365.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 6008.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 29).
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 4. Page 2963.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2934.) (January 21).
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 21.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 19.
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2895.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2886.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 13 in E., U., & C. pending receipt.
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E., U., & C.
- Set for hearing January 12 in T. & H. pending receipt.
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 418.) (March 25).
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 25.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (11)
August 24, 2016: Unfinished Business SB247 Lara Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
August 22, 2016: SB 247 Lara Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E.
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
June 29, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 13, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
January 27, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB247 Lara
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 10
January 21, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
January 13, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
January 12, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
May 11, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor