+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- January 15 hearing postponed by committee.
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 15.
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor