+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 205, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2178.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2627.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 997.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 25.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and V.A.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 15, 2019: Unfinished Business SB245 Chang et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 11, 2019: SB 245 Chang Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 3, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
May 9, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB245 Chang et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
April 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
March 25, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor