+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2022.
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 3159.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 3878.) Ordered to the Senate.
On February 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 17. Page 3542.)
- Ordered to third reading.
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20).
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 26 hearing postponed by committee.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- July 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 30 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1330.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1184.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 703.) (April 7).
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
- Read first time.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
March 21, 2022: Unfinished Business SB245 Gonzalez et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 5
March 17, 2022: SB 245 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Akilah Weber
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 7
February 14, 2022: SB 245 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Akilah Weber Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 8
June 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB245 Gonzalez et al.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor