+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 704, Statutes of 2023.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2744.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 12, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 1. Page 3315.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (September 1).
On August 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 29, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 28, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On June 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
- Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
On May 31, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1360.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1162.) (May 18).
On May 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 685.) (April 11).
On March 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
September 13, 2023: Unfinished Business SB244 Eggman et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
September 12, 2023: SB 244 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Wicks
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 14
July 5, 2023: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
June 27, 2023: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 30, 2023: Senate 3rd Reading SB244 Eggman et al.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 18, 2023: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 24, 2023: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 11, 2023: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor