+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 1660.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 2148.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17).
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 836.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 729.) (April 21).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 418.) (March 25).
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 25.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
June 29, 2015: Unfinished Business SB242 Monning Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2015: SB 242 Monning Senate Third Reading By WEBER
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
June 17, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 30, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB242 Monning
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
April 21, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor