+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 845.) (April 24).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and L., P.E. & R.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 24, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor