+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
On August 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 764.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 428.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 21.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 23, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
July 12, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB24 Portantino
- Yeas: 40
March 21, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor