+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (36)
On October 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 657, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2434.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2453.)
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2412.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3278.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 11).
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3147.)
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2945.)
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30).
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On August 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1098.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1009.) (May 23).
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 882.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 12, 2013: SB 239 Hernandez Third Reading Urgency By MITCHELL
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
September 12, 2013: Unfinished Supp 2 SB239 Hernandez Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
August 20, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 19
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB239 Hernandez Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
May 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
May 20, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor