+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 635, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2210.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2478.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On June 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 2124.)
On June 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 14 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 612.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 455.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 10.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2021: Unfinished Business SB239 B. & F.I. (Limón) Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2021: SB 239 B. & F.I. Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 10
July 14, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
June 29, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
March 25, 2021: Consent Calendar SB239 B. & F.I.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Banking and Financial Institutions
Type:
Primary Sponsor