+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1947.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 2599.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 3).
On June 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 675.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 466.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2013: Unfinished Business SB238 Liu Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
August 19, 2013: SB 238 Liu Senate Third Reading By GATTO
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
June 24, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB238 Liu
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
April 9, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor