+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and HIGHER ED.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1197.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1093.) (May 16).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- March 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 3, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review]
- Yeas: 12
May 21, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB237 Hertzberg
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
April 22, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor