+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HUM. S.
On January 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2723.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file on motion of Senator Wiener.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Wiener.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 29 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 422.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 9.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (7)
June 28, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 8
January 6, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB234 Wiener
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
March 9, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing]
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor