+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- July 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1342.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 918.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
June 1, 2021: Special Consent SB232
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 10, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor