+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2441.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2783.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1296.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1149.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 4.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 3, 2015: Unfinished Business SB229 Roth Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 2, 2015: SB 229 Roth Senate Third Reading By BROWN
- Yeas: 80
June 23, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
June 23, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB229 Roth
- Yeas: 40
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 4, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 21, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 21, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor