+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 352, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2494.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Urgency clause adopted.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2487.)
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing September 3.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2273.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2636.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 880.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 649.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
September 4, 2015: Unfinished Business SB225 Wieckowski Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
September 4, 2015: Unfinished Business SB225 Wieckowski Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
September 3, 2015: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 7
August 27, 2015: SB 225 Wieckowski Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 15, 2015: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2015: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB225 Wieckowski
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
April 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor