+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 601, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5311.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5248.)
- Set for hearing August 29.
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5112.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6179.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2776.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2738.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On December 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 10.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB225 Wiener Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 29, 2022: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
August 24, 2022: SB 225 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Arambula
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
August 11, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
June 28, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 3
January 18, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB225 Wiener
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 11
January 10, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 5