+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 404.) (April 3).
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 3, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor