+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (13)
+ − Actions (50)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 5312.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On June 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On June 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Robert Rivas.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Robert Rivas.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and U. & E.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1319.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1183.) (May 20).
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 17.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 985.) (April 29).
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 2. Page 755.) (April 12).
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 12.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- March 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 15.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and E.Q.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
- Referred to Coms. on EQ., E., U. & C., and JUD.
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB222 Dodd et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2022: SB 222 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Robert Rivas
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 15
June 30, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 3
June 16, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 1, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB222 Dodd et al.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 17, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 12, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor