+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
- From Assembly without further action.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 22 set for first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 9. Page 2843.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to second reading.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 10.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Cortese.
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1420.)
- Ordered to inactive file.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1183.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- March 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 8.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 3, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB213 Cortese et al.
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 10
June 3, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB213 Cortese et al. Reconsider
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 19, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 22, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1