+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On August 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and E.S. & T.M.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1319.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1179.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 622.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 370.) (March 8).
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 8.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and EQ.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2018: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB210 Leyva et al.
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 5, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
March 8, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor