+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 203, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1946.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2599.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 6).
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- (Corrected August 5.)
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- (Corrected June 27.)
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1110.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1005.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 590.) (April 17).
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On December 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
On December 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 22, 2013: Unfinished Business SB21 Roth Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2013: SB 21 Roth Senate Third Reading By MEDINA
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
August 6, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB21 Roth Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 39
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
May 6, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 17, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9