+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (42)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Veto sustained.
- Stricken from file.
On October 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2866.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3263.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1180.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 797.) (April 23).
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 2).
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 11, 2019: Unfinished Business SB202 Wilk et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 10, 2019: SB 202 Wilk Senate Third Reading By Bloom
- Yeas: 79
August 30, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
July 3, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
June 25, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture]
- Yeas: 12
May 21, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB202 Wilk et al.
- Yeas: 38
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 2, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciarrded">No Votes Recorded:
- Yeas: 4
April 2, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4