+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (37)
On September 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2021.
On September 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2487.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 2777.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- June 29 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 20).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 935.) (April 27).
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
- (Corrected April 28).
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 778.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
September 8, 2021: Unfinished Business SB2 Bradford et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
September 3, 2021: SB 2 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Akilah Weber
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 9
July 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
July 6, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB2 Bradford et al.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 10, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor