+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 4).
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- March 28 hearing postponed by committee.
- Set for hearing March 28.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 4, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor