+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and APPR.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor