+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1294.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1149.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 20 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 349.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 18.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB191 Block
- Yeas: 40
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 18, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
March 18, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor