+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (43)
On October 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 421, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3012.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3489.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 3223.)
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- September 11 hearing postponed by committee.
On September 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and JUD.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1312.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1176.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 17 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 429.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 21.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C., JUD., and RLS.
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 15, 2017: SB 19 Hill Senate Third Reading By LEVINE
- Yeas: 79
September 15, 2017: Unfinished Business SB19 Hill et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 11, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
June 21, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB19 Hill
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 4, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor