+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 770, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- (Corrected September 19).
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2904.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3156.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 12).
On July 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1134.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 853.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 14, 2017: Special Consent Calendar SB189
- Yeas: 40
September 11, 2017: SB 189 Bradford Senate Third Reading By DALY
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
July 12, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB189 Bradford
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 26, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor