+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 232, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 2467.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23).
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 772.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to second reading.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 417.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 25.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- March 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 18.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and RLS.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 17, 2015: SB 186 Jackson Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 14
June 23, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
April 27, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB186 Jackson
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
March 25, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor