+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 2794.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1284.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1148.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 593.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
- Set for hearing April 13.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 2, 2015: SB 185 De León Senate Third Reading By BONTA
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 3
August 27, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
June 24, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB185 De León
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 27, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 13, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
April 13, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor