+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 210, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1947.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2597.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2480.)
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 774.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 566.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2013: Unfinished Business SB184 Committee on GOV. & F. (Wolk) Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2013: SB 184 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By ACHADJIAN
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 26, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
May 2, 2013: Consent Calendar 2nd SB184 Committee on GOV. & F. (Wolk)
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 3
April 17, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (6)
Committee on Governance and Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor