+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1972.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to unfinished business.
- From inactive file.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Wolk.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2110.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 495.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 291.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 13.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 26, 2013: Unfinished Business SB182 Committee on GOV. & F. (Wolk) Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 20, 2013: SB 182 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
June 12, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
April 11, 2013: Consent Calendar 2nd SB182 Committee on GOV. & F. (Wolk)
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 2
March 13, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (6)
Committee on Governance and Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor