+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1872.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2258.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16).
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 558.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 507.) (April 7).
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- March 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 24.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 9, 2015: Unfinished Business SB176 Mitchell Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
July 6, 2015: SB 176 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By LACKEY
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB176 Mitchell
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
April 7, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor