+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Held in committee and under submission.
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1179.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1008.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 464.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 14, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB176 Galgiani
- Yeas: 39
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 9, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor